Trustees BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1058853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin Hugh Silvey Chair 15 October 2021
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Canon Charles Water Edward Ralph Buchan Trustee 29 April 2025
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew Street Trustee 29 April 2025
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
David John Maggs Trustee 29 April 2025
None on record
SANDRA MARY O'SHEA Trustee 29 April 2025
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Reverend Canon Daniel Frank Tyndall Trustee 29 April 2025
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, REDCLIFFE
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHURCHES' NETWORK
Recently registered
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Colin Grant Havill Trustee 29 April 2025
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Venerable Reverend Rebecca Ann Waring Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Caroline Jowett-Ive Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Gene Austin Joyner Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Rev Dr Adrian John Howkins Trustee 01 November 2019
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time