Financial history NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1058859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £62.28k £1.57k £25.05k £29.76k £24.14k
Total expenditure £50.28k £8.47k £28.53k £45.83k £37.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A