Financial history KIRTON YOUTH CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1058916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.91k £10.57k £17.20k £18.50k £25.19k
Total expenditure £13.57k £14.13k £17.26k £19.03k £21.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A N/A