THE A.M. PERRY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trustees do not accept any unsolicited applications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.96k | £9.33k | £14.20k | £15.32k | £26.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.83k | £11.30k | £26.54k | £6.19k | £25.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1ST JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(A) FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A LIKE NOTICE DIRECT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT WHERE THE FOUNDER HAS NOT BY THE 5TH APRIL IN THE INCOME TAX YEAR FOLLOWING THAT IN WHICH THE INCOME ARISES GIVEN A DIRECTION WHICH FULLY DISPOSES OF THE INCOME THEN SUCH INCOME SHALL BE DISPOSED OF IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUB-CLAUSE (B) (B) SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY SUCH DIRECTION AND INSOFAR AS ANY SUCH DIRECTION IS NOT EXHAUSTIVE TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT OF THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window