Spectacle Theatre LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1979 in the heart of the former Welsh coalfields, Spectacle Theatre Ltd pioneered access to live theatre and new writing in Welsh and English. Through partnership working, we deliver an innovative bi-lingual theatre service (workshops, production and mentoring), locally, nationally and internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,857 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 November 1996: Standard registration
- SPECTACLE THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Stevenson | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Marina Johnson | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eveangeleis Tudball | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Vandyck | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Griffiths | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Watt-Rees | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy James Cockram | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.65k | £171.17k | £140.50k | £205.52k | £248.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.91k | £137.95k | £132.87k | £189.91k | £185.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 1981 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 1996. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 MAR 2017 as amended on 01 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDCUATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL THEATRE AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Welsh Hills Works
Jenkin Street
PORTH
Mid Glamorgan
CF39 9PP
- Phone:
- 07849513883
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window