Financial history THE BOSHAM BURIAL GROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £7.34k £6.43k £6.02k £5.77k £7.82k
Total expenditure £7.75k £4.54k £5.64k £4.68k £6.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A