LEDBURY POETRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity seeks to advance the education of the public in the appreciation of the arts in all their forms, including, but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing, the presentation, organisation and promotion of poetry. This is achieved by the production of the LEDBURY POETRY FESTIVAL and bringing poetry actively to children, the elderly and mentally distressed throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £180,279 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
86 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 November 1996: Standard registration
- LEDBURY POETRY FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Best | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kimberly Campanello | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Cairns | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Howe | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Dudley Hickson | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sandeep Parmar | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mary Read-Brown | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN ARSCOTT | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.76k | £157.84k | £162.85k | £356.43k | £389.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.58k | £130.00k | £150.31k | £339.56k | £344.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.41k | £70.36k | £58.83k | £171.07k | £180.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 1996 as amended on 28 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS, INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PRESENTATION, ORGANISING AND PROMOTION OF POETRY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barrett Browning Institute
Bye Street
LEDBURY
Herefordshire
HR8 2AA
- Phone:
- 01531 636232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window