THE FRIENDS OF ST. ANDREWS CHURCH AT LITTLE CRESSINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of the fabric of an active Anglican Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 December 1996: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF LT CRESSINGHAM CHURCH (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL PETER GOULDSTONE | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Marion Gouldstone | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL ANTHONY POWELL MBE | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Katie Alison Walker Powell | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Frances Helen Jones | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £1.64k | £2.01k | £1.41k | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.21k | £457 | £519 | £921 | £1.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN THE PARISH OF LITTLE CRESSINGHAM (B) TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, PRESERVE, RECONSTRUCT AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. ANDREWS AT LITTLE CRESSINGHAM, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE AND EQUIPMENT. (C) TO PROVIDE OR AUGMENT THE STIPEND OF THE MINISTER OF ST. ANDREW'S CHURCH AT LITTLE CRESSINGHAM AS APPROVED BY MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY, TO ASSIST THE MINISTER IN MEETING THE EXPENSES INCURRED IN THE PERFORMANC EOF HIS DUTIES AND TO MEET THE EXPENSES OF THOSE ASSISTING THE MINISTER IN HIS WORK WITHIN THE PARISH. (D) TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY MEANS OF BIBLE CLASSES, SUNDAY SCHOOLS AND OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
LITTLE CRESSINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clermont House
Little Cressingham
Thetford
IP25 6LY
- Phone:
- 01953881997
- Email:
- dmdclermont@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window