Financial history FORDHAM COMBINED CHARITIES (COUNTESS OF HUNTINGDON'S CONNEXION)

Charity number: 1059821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £894 £715 £477 £1.19k £1.56k
Total expenditure £1.05k £1.44k £930 £9.78k £911
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A