BAYNARDS ZAMBIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of poverty in Zambia by funding projects involved in agriculture, health and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 18 December 1996: Standard registration
- B Z T (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Napier | Chair | 16 October 1996 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stewart Napier | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Jane warren | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.49k | £564.02k | £315.34k | £266.75k | £6.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.91k | £363.15k | £360.89k | £448.28k | £3.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £564.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £363.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £960 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 25 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF THE PUBLIC IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE BY LAW IN ANY PART OF ZAMBIA AND SUCH OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY: 1) DEVELOPING AND ENCOURAGING SUSTAINABLE FOOD PRODUCTION THROUGH AGRICULTURAL AND RELATED PROJECTS OF ALL TYPES INCLUDING MARKETING AND TRADING PROGRAMMES. 2) DEVELOPING PROJECTS WHICH ENCOURAGE THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE REDUCTION AND ELIMINATION OF DISEASE. 2) ADVANCING AND PROMOTING EDUCATION IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
ZAMBIA AND OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAYNARDS MANOR
BAYNARDS
RUDGWICK
HORSHAM
RH12 3AD
- Phone:
- 07785347644
- Email:
- r.s.napier9@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window