Financial history THE JOLIBA TRUST

Charity number: 1059919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £317.70k £302.04k £235.68k £256.47k £458.43k
Total expenditure £306.95k £310.75k £241.41k £253.72k £352.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A