Trustees NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME DIVISION, GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRUDY JANE REALE Chair 01 August 2016
STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
STOKE-ON-TRENT NORTH, STOKE-ON-TRENT SOUTH, NEWCASTLE AND LONGTON DIVISIONS OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Rosie Edwards Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Carolyn Charlton Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Sharon Simcock Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Emily Griffiths Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Tracey Briggs Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Glenda Lockley Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Naomi Ashenden Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
CAROL ANN GOLDSACK Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
HELEN JAYNE AKERS Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
MARIAN ROSE DENHAM Trustee
None on record
ROSEMARY EILEEN HOWELLS Trustee
None on record
CAROL JANE EDWARDS Trustee
None on record