Financial history THE FRIENDS OF RANELAGH SCHOOL, BRACKNELL

Charity number: 1060543
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.48k £55.23k £48.18k £39.21k £29.44k
Total expenditure £98.17k £21.11k £89.17k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A