THE JAMES WILLIAM PEMBERTON TRUST

Charity number: 1060590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object per the Will Trust Deed is to carry out works of benefit to the Parish Church of St Editha Tamworth including: furtherance of religious and other charitable work of the church; exceptional items of expenditure re restoration of the fabric of building or new construction work; assist the Council from time to time by way of loan at the absolute discretion of the Trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,738
Total expenditure: £5,334

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew Simon Lythall Chair 31 August 2023
RAWLET TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH
Received: On time
Stephen Kingsley Taylor Trustee 31 August 2023
None on record
John Frederick Mulvey Trustee 31 August 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH
Received: On time
Briony Brookman Trustee 27 July 2015
None on record
Gwen Louise Wilkinson Trustee 11 March 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.43k £13.59k £15.07k £25.69k £16.74k
Total expenditure £5.94k £16.41k £7.29k £11.33k £5.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 January 2021 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
35 Melmerby
Wilnecote
TAMWORTH
B77 4LP
Phone:
01827892877
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available