ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL AND COLLEGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Non-maintained residential and day special school, independent specialist college and linked adult care homes and other training and residential activities that provide support to and progression from school and college for learners from 5 years to 25 years (and above) to maximise their independence and fulfil their potential within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 28 February 1997: Standard registration
- 20 March 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 20 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1063184 AMBITIOUS ABOUT AUTISM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.62m | £12.25m | £15.14m | £13.86m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.12m | £11.54m | £14.04m | £20.91m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.47m | £10.81m | £13.55m | £11.23m | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £101.67k | £1.16m | £1.34m | £1.66m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £116.30k | £281.58k | £246.03k | £244.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.58k | £0 | £0 | £5.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.50m | £11.97m | £14.89m | £12.89m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.77k | £0 | £3.72k | £24.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.14k | £1.40k | £696.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.09m | £11.50m | £14.02m | £13.64m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £35.07k | £43.38k | £24.68k | £20.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.71k | £0 | £31.39k | £33.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.25m | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JANUARY 1997 AND AMENDED 17 JULY 2003 as amended on 26 Apr 2021 as amended on 26 Apr 2021 as amended on 22 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING OR BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window