Register of Charities - The Charity Commission BISHOP STEERE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 234518-45
Removed charity
Governing document
RESOLUTION PASSED 20/11/1883 AND SCHEME OF 31/12/1964 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE TRAINING OF AFRICAN ORDINANDS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of