Register of Charities - The Charity Commission HILDA CHRISTINE HAWORTH

Charity number: 234518-172
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL ON 21/07/1975 AND SCHEME OF 24/10/1977 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE MEDICAL MISSIONARY WORK OF THE CHARITY IN THE PROVINCE OF SOUTH AFRICA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of