Register of Charities - The Charity Commission OLIVIA WAY FOR HOMES OF REST
Charity number: 234518-197
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN P.P.R. ON 20/02/1929 AND SCHEME OF 06/09/1966
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
HOMES OF REST FOR WORKERS OR MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY IN NEED THEREOF OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE SOCIETY THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
- 21 August 1969: Standard registration
- 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.