Charity overview OLIVIA WAY FOR HOMES OF REST

Charity Number: 234518-197
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN P.P.R. ON 20/02/1929 AND SCHEME OF 06/09/1966 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
HOMES OF REST FOR WORKERS OR MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY IN NEED THEREOF OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE SOCIETY THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 21 August 1969: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of