Register of Charities - The Charity Commission KINDERSLEY TRUST
Charity number: 234518-200
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTER DATED 03/08/1919 AND SOCIETY'S MINUTES OF MEETING HELD 10/10/1957
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BISHOP OF RANGOON FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF MISSIONARY WORK WITHIN HIS DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
- 27 November 1967: Standard registration
- 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.