Register of Charities - The Charity Commission A T WESTON BEQUEST

Charity number: 234518-254
Removed charity
Governing document
STATEMENT RECEIVED 10/11/1964 AND SCHEME OF 29/03/1967 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
IN SUPPORTING THE "PRISCILL" BED IN ST. STEPHEN'S HOSPITAL, YUNGCHING CHINA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of