Charity overview VARLEY FUND NO 1

Charity number: 234518-269
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTERS DATED 26/08/1937 AND 11/09/1937 AND MINUTES OF MEETING HELD 07/10/1937 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
IN AID OF SOCIETY'S WORK AMONGST BRITISH PEOPLE OVERSEAS, WITH PREFERENCE TO WORK AMONGST ISOLATED SETTLERS OTHERWISE FOR GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of