Accounts and annual returns INVOLVEMENT AND PARTICIPATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 200468
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 February 2024 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 February 2024 11 September 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time