Financial history OCKLEY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.03k £7.76k £7.77k £22.73k £8.88k
Total expenditure £7.21k £9.39k £7.96k £9.64k £11.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A