DEVON QUEEN VICTORIA COMMEMORATION AND KING EDWARD VII MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to apply the income of the Charity's Trust Fund for the benefit of the Hospitals and Infirmaries in the County of Devon and of convalescent homes working in connection therewith in such manner as the Executive & Finance Committee shall from time to time direct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 25 January 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE MARY PAGE-TURNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER MARGARET MORRIS | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN THURSTANS WALDRON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.98k | £4.97k | £5.01k | £5.00k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.36k | £4.49k | £4.19k | £5.48k | £5.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1897 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING LIVES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS ACROSS DEVON
Area of benefit
DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodwater House
Pynes Hill
Exeter
EX2 5WR
- Phone:
- 01392688688
- Email:
- alan.barr@michelmores.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window