WEST AND MIDDLE CHINNOCK CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH POOR PERSONS WHO RESIDE IN THE AREA OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF WEST CHINNOCK (INCLUDING MIDDLE CHINNOCK) AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT EITHER IN THE SUPPLY OF ARTICLES IN KIND OR IN GRANTS OF MONEY; PROVIDED THAT INCOME OF THE CHARITIES SHALL NOT BE APPLIED IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 February 1962: Standard registration
- SARAH WOODCOCK (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas John Clarke | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Robert Cochran | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
PHILIP EDWARD NICHOLS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONALD NYE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK KEITH DODGE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136 | £139 | £141 | £145 | £146 | |
|
Total expenditure | £236 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £436 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 AUGUST 1958 AS AMENDED ON 24 JANUARY 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH POOR PERSONS WHO RESIDE IN THE AREA OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF WEST CHINNOCK (INCLUDING MIDDLE CHINNOCK) AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT EITHER IN THE SUPPLY OF ARTICLES IN KIND OR IN GRANTS OF MONEY; PROVIDED THAT INCOME OF THE CHARITIES SHALL NOT BE APPLIED IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WEST CHINNOCK
Linked charities
- 12 February 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 RIDGWAY
WEST CHINNOCK
CREWKERNE
TA18 7PY
- Phone:
- 01935881263
- Email:
- barlands@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window