Trustees THE HUNTINGDONSHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Charity Number: 202573

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Louise Sandell | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Jessica Davis | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Fiona Corden | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Francis Mizuro | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jeanna Morgan | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Murphy | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Yare | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Antonia Tarpey | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Ruston | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Darren Fletcher | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.