STANTON ST JOHN CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 202853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Investment income is distributed to the elderly and disadvantaged of the parish of Stanton St John to help with winter fuel costs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £717
Total expenditure: £750

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 April 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STANTON ST JOHN CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Ebbs Chair
None on record
Caroline Clark Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Rev Anthea Christine Beresford Trustee 10 September 2020
DR ROBERT PINK
Received: On time
SUSAN JOAN BAKER Trustee 01 January 2018
OXFORDSHIRE FUND FOR MUSIC
Received: On time
DAVID CHARLES JAMES PULLEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £626 £635 £654 £1.06k £717
Total expenditure £450 £525 £700 £875 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 FEBRUARY 1968
Charitable objects
FUEL FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN PARISH OF STANTON ST. JOHN. RESIDUE OF INCOME FOR RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS IN THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STANTON ST JOHN
Registration history
  • 10 April 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
STONE COTTAGE
MILL STREET
STANTON ST. JOHN
OXFORD
OX33 1HQ
Phone:
01865351491
Website:

No information available