JOHN SOUTHBY AND OTHERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the parish of Buckland, Oxfordshire for the benefit of the residents of the village and parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Wildman | Chair | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Connolly | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kathleen Thompson | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Jackson | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Podbery | Trustee | 12 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.73k | £87.98k | £86.75k | £129.31k | £110.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.35k | £114.46k | £56.30k | £303.29k | £83.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21 FEB 1911 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BUCKLAND AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE FROM PUBLIC RATES AND TAXES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BUCKLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mount Pleasant Farmhouse
Buckland
FARINGDON
SN7 8PY
- Phone:
- 07768681704
- Email:
- CHARITYJSANDO@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window