ARTHUR GOODWIN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity manages the Almshouses at Waddesdon, and applies income for repairs and for the benefit of the Almspeople.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 December 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
S.J.P. TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|||||
SJP Trust Corporation Limited | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Wainman | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Anna Louise Coates | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dennis Stray | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOCTOR ALAN DOUGLAS WATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.59k | £27.16k | £34.40k | £32.16k | £36.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.27k | £21.63k | £29.59k | £38.05k | £32.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19TH OCTOBER 1966 as amended on 01 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF WADDESDON AND UPPER WINCHENDON.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WADDESDON AND UPPER WINCHENDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O J ROTHSCHILD SERVICES LIMITED
Estate Office
Queen Street
WADDESDON
AYLESBURY
HP18 0JW
- Phone:
- 01296653410
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window