THE AKRILL HOMES

Charity Number: 203711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide almshouses for elderly residents in West Bromwich

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £60,220
Total expenditure: £48,239

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sandwell

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSA WILDING Chair 28 July 2011
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time
Jessica Pate Trustee 01 October 2023
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time
Brett William Bunn Trustee 01 October 2023
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time
DIANA MARGARET WILLS Trustee 02 December 2015
GEORGE AND THOMAS HENRY SALTER TRUST
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time
DAVID COLES Trustee 12 March 1983
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time
HILARY VEASEY-PUGH Trustee
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time
GRAHAM DENNIS WOODALL Trustee
CHARITY OF JANE PATRICIA ECCLES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £51.88k £52.34k £50.51k £57.80k £60.22k
Total expenditure £43.11k £40.65k £42.04k £39.88k £48.24k
Income from government contracts £488 N/A N/A £227 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £272 £227 N/A £227

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 23 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 18 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 HIGHCROFT DRIVE
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B74 4SX
Phone:
01213534020
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available