THE SPEECHLEY REST HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses for Aged and Poor Persons who are, or were, inhabitants of the Parish of Yaxley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Black | Chair | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Buxton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martyn Russell | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS FRAN RUSSELL | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|||||
JOYCE NEEDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £5.06k | £5.02k | £5.02k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60k | £9.19k | £1.01k | £1.01k | £27.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 25TH AUGUST 1948.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSED FOR AGED AND POOR PORSONS WHO ARE OR WERE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF YAXLEY.
Area of benefit
YAXLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 BROADWAY
YAXLEY
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 3JD
- Phone:
- 017330244493
- Email:
- fran@lancersgap.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window