Accounts and annual returns PETERBOROUGH ALMSHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 205383
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 08 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On Time