Financial history PETERBOROUGH ALMSHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 205383
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 30/06/2018 31/12/2018
Total gross income £236.54k £265.73k £262.32k £361.82k £131.93k
Total expenditure £262.75k £241.81k £295.56k £371.14k £162.35k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A