Accounts and annual returns NORWICH HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity Number: 205449
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2022 08 May 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 December 2021 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required