Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID ISAACS FUND
Charity Number: 205896

Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 September 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 September 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Your cookie preferences have been updated
Cookies on My Charity Commission Account
Cookies are files saved on your phone, tablet or computer when you visit a website.
We use cookies to collect information about how you use My Charity Commission Account.
Cookie settings
We use 2 types of cookie.
Cookies that measure website use
We use Google Analytics to measure how you use the website so we can improve it based on user needs. We do not allow Google to use or share the data about how you use this site with third parties.
Google Analytics sets cookies that store anonymised information about:
- how you got to the site
- the pages you visit and how long you spend on each page
- what you click on while you're visiting the site
Strictly necessary cookies
These essential cookies do things like enable core functionality such as security, network management, and accessibility.
They always need to be on.
Find out more about cookies on My Charity Commission Account.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window