Accounts and annual returns THE MARY GREEN CHARITY

Charity number: 206138
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 21 August 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2021 28 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2020 28 August 2021 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Not Required