Financial history JEWISH MEMORIAL COUNCIL

Charity Number: 206565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £219 £235 £204 £0 £343
Total expenditure £40.70k £40.75k £43.95k £56.48k £170.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A