Trustees SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL INDUSTRY
Charity number: 206883

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Greg Clark Rt Hon | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ana Perroni Laloe | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Birk | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victor Christou | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Curtis | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Compton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIZABETH ROWSELL | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoff Mackey | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jeremy Parker | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Waterhouse | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharali Malik | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacqueline Sheridan | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEVIN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH SKERRATT | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr BEN ALSTON | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN HAGUE | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVE ALLEN | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIFFANY WOOD | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFFREY FOWLER | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.