Financial history SAMUEL WILSON'S LOAN CHARITY

Charity number: 206964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £84.48k £104.55k £135.31k £145.02k £90.14k
Total expenditure £22.44k £31.61k £4.08k £200.75k £151.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A