Financial history THE BETENSON TRUST

Charity Number: 207019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £32.57k £33.37k £35.43k £37.79k £55.57k
Total expenditure £22.64k £26.66k £37.28k £53.79k £150.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A