THE HARLEY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES INCLUDING MAKING OF GRANTS TO CLERGYMEN'S WIDOWS AND TO POOR BLIND PERSONS. THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE, UPKEEP, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF HEREFORD CATHEDRAL AND OTHER CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCHES IN DIOCESE OF HEREFORD. FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO OTHER CHARITIES, PARTICULARLY IN THE HEREFORDSHIRE AREA WHERE FUNDS ALLOW.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 07 November 2022: Funds received from 527151 FREE SCHOOL (HON. EDWARD HARLEY)
- THE HONOURABLE MISS FRANCES HARLEY CHARITY (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Mortimer Harley OBE | Chair |
|
||||||||||
The Right Reverend Richard Charles Jackson | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
TIMOTHY MICHAEL EVANS TD DL | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Harley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.64k | £6.96k | £8.42k | £8.76k | £8.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.70k | £2.83k | £12.48k | £25.32k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JANUARY 1841 (UV 4 P 495 AND UV 162 P24) AND SCHEMES DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1973 AND 30TH OCTOBER 1978 TOGETHER WITH RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 AUGUST 2009 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 28 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG CHURCH OF ENGLAND CLERGY AND THEIR WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF PHYSICAL INCAPACITY INCLUDING BLIND PERSONS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD C) THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE, UPKEEP, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF HEREFORD CATHEDRAL AND OTHER CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCHES IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD D) WHERE FUNDS ARE AVAILABLE, TO SUPPORT BY WAY WAY OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES, MOST PARTICULARLY THOSE OPERATING IN THE HEREFORDSHIRE AREA.
Area of benefit
1. NOT DEFINED 2. HEREFORD RADNOR BRECON
Contact information
- Address:
-
E M Harley
The Harley Estate
Brampton Bryan
Bucknell
SY7 0DH
- Phone:
- 01547530280
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window