FITZGERALD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision to individuals in need, low cost accomodation in Almshouses located in Seaford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Grimble | Chair | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stafford George Cheal | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wendy Slade | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanne Wendy Martyr | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fears | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Lloyd Thompson | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev James William Hollingsworth | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Brian Paul Millar | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Patricia White | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/03/2020 | 25/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.92k | £98.92k | £84.50k | £77.54k | £75.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.20k | £187.20k | £71.94k | £63.04k | £53.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR ELDERLY AND INFIRM PERSONS WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN SIXTY YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH PREFERENCE GIVEN AS FOLLOWS: (I) FIRSTLY TO THOSE WHO HAVE LIVED WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR AT LEAST THE PREVIOUS TEN YEARS; AND (II) SECONDLY TO THOSE WHO HAVE LIVED WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR ANY PERIOD OF TIME. (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
THE AREA WITHIN 9 MILES OF SEAFORD PARISH CHURCH, EXCLUDING LEWES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
G3 Architecture
26 Sutton Park Road
SEAFORD
East Sussex
BN25 1QU
- Phone:
- 01323 404880
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window