THE PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1917, PDSA is the UK's leading veterinary charity. Our mission is to improve the life of every pet. We prevent illness, suffering and unnecessary death of pets; educate people about their welfare needs, and treat pets needing our help across the UK. In 2018 we provided 2.5 million treatments to more than 430,000 pets. Our services are funded entirely by public support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£113,975,000
Donations and legacies | £79.57m | |
Charitable activities | £14.35m | |
Other trading activities | £18.75m | |
Investments | £1.31m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£114,550,000
Raising funds | £27.37m | |
Charitable activities | £87.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£900,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.37m | |
Charitable expenditure | £87.18m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.37m | |
Charitable expenditure | £87.18m | |
Retained for future use | £325.00k |
People

1748 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
2800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 31 |
£70k to £80k | 13 |
£80k to £90k | 9 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 08 February 1995: Removed
- P D S A (Working name)
- PDSA PETAID SERVICES (Working name)
- PETAID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Ruth Hutchinson BA Hons | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phoenix | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Morgan BSc Hons | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRODIE LISTER | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GORDON ANDREW HOCKEY | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Tattersall | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY MARGARET REILLY | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Professor Gary England | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Carole Pomfret MA ACA | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES MILLER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.69m | £92.17m | £105.38m | £106.65m | £113.98m | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.02m | £91.34m | £91.71m | £105.08m | £114.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.08m | £1.83m | N/A | £4.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £72.65m | £62.70m | £81.60m | £73.28m | £79.57m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £24.64m | £16.39m | £13.67m | £19.68m | £18.75m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.47m | £9.06m | £8.74m | £12.30m | £14.35m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £935.00k | £1.21m | £1.06m | £1.00m | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Other | -£2.00k | £2.81m | £305.00k | £395.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £50.22m | £40.14m | £58.73m | £51.11m | £56.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £71.09m | £65.25m | £69.24m | £79.30m | £87.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £30.93m | £26.09m | £22.48m | £25.78m | £27.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £222.00k | £364.00k | £342.00k | £369.00k | £323.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £51.00k | £41.00k | £82.00k | £50.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.89m | £21.47m | £21.55m | £22.64m | £29.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £68.29m | £71.68m | £77.35m | £72.40m | £59.03m | |
|
Other assets | £40.92m | £40.03m | £45.71m | £47.74m | £53.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£35.70m | -£47.10m | -£41.10m | -£22.50m | -£24.30m | |
|
Total liabilities | £9.20m | £7.93m | £8.45m | £13.23m | £14.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ACT OF PARLIAMENT DATED 14 JULY 1949 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 1956 STATUTORY INSTRUMENT AS AMENDED BY SCHEME BOUGHT INTO EFFECT BY THE CHARITIES (PEOPLE'S DISPENSARY FOR SICK ANIMALS) ORDER 2015 DATED 10/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE: A) THE PROVISION OF FREE MEDICAL OR SURGICAL TREATMENT, OR SUCH TREATMENT AT REDUCED CHARGES, TO ANIMALS BELONGING TO PERSONS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SERVICES OF A VETERINARY SURGEON; B) THE PREVENTION OF SUFFERING OF ANIMALS BY THE PROVISION OF PREVENTATIVE TREATMENT, CARE AND ADVICE (WHETHER FREE, AT A REDUCED CHARGE OR AT FULL CHARGE); C) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL HEALTH AND WELFARE IN GENERAL; D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY OTHER MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 08 February 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
P D S A
WHITECHAPEL WAY
PRIORSLEE
TELFORD
TF2 9PQ
- Phone:
- 01952290999
- Email:
- knee.simon@pdsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window