FONNEREAU ROAD HEALTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the protection of health by making grants for the provision of general medical health services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- IPSWICH SURGICAL HOME (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL CHARLES FARTHING | Chair | 21 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Gareth Henry Fisher Taylor | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Fletcher | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Renata Chester | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Thomas Crossman | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Duncan Craig McNab | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.44k | £51.48k | £71.59k | £71.52k | £63.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.93k | £48.78k | £127.68k | £43.88k | £31.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/10/2000
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BENEFIT TO THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GENERAL MEDICAL HEALTH CARE SERVICES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Vicarage
8 Fonnereau Road
IPSWICH
IP1 3JP
- Phone:
- 07894 795214
- Email:
- renatachester@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window