SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF NATURAL HISTORY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society is instituted for the historical and bibliographical study of the growth of all branches of natural history in all periods and cultures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 October 1962: Standard registration
- SHNH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Daniel David Ashby | Chair | 04 April 2024 |
|
|||||
William Clifford John Beharrell | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathan Smith | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Cowie | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penelope Anne Secord | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Shaughnessy | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malgosia Nowak-Kemp | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Robinson | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geraldine Reid | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Reilly | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Larsson | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JO HATTON | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM NOBLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.11k | £12.09k | £13.54k | £10.76k | £12.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.18k | £14.93k | £10.81k | £8.18k | £14.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE-LAWS OF THE SOCIETY FOUNDED IN 1936, AS AMENDED 28TH MARCH 1983, 18TH MARCH 1988, 23RD JUNE 2000, 26 APRIL 2002 AND 15 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS INSTITUTED FOR THE HISTORICAL AND BIBLIOGRAPHICAL STUDY OF ALL BRANCHES OF NATURAL HISTORY, INCLUDING THEIR SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ASPECTS, ACROSS ALL CULTURES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATURAL HISTORY MUSEUM
CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 5BD
- Phone:
- 0141 330 2194
- Email:
- secretary@shnh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window