Trustees SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF NATURAL HISTORY
Charity number: 210355

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Daniel David Ashby | Chair | 04 April 2024 |
|
|||||
William Clifford John Beharrell | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathan Smith | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Cowie | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penelope Anne Secord | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Shaughnessy | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malgosia Nowak-Kemp | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Robinson | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geraldine Reid | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Reilly | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Larsson | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JO HATTON | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM NOBLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.