Financial history SIR WILLIAM BRAMPTON GURDON COTTAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 210361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £61.81k £42.55k £27.40k £35.15k £29.20k
Total expenditure £71.71k £37.12k £25.20k £29.14k £19.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A