TOC H

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims and objects of Toc H remain unchanged and continue to be to:-Advance the Christian religion-Advance education especially in regard to the study and practices of the social services-Promote the efficiency of our Armed Forces-Promote the rehabilitation of offenders against the laws of Our Realm -Promote such other charitable purposes as Toc H may determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 December 1994: Standard registration
- 13 September 1996: Removed
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY DRUMMOND | Chair | 26 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sharen Kaur Ravat | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tracy Charnock | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rahoul Gaurang Naik | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Child | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Poole | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gill | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.56k | £137.47k | £94.16k | £282.94k | £144.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.33k | £190.21k | £178.10k | £374.62k | £516.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.25k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 10/06/1971 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ESPECIALLY IN REGARD TO THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE SOCIAL SCIENCES, TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE, TO GIVE RELIEF TO THE POOR AND AGED, TO GIVE ASSISTANCE TO THE SICK AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO TOC H MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Linked charities
- 08 December 1994 : Standard registration
- 13 September 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Toc H
483 Green Lanes
LONDON
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 01214433552
- Email:
- info@toch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window