PEST HOUSES FUND

Charity number: 211090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making grants for the benefit of the Ecclesiastical Parish of St Mary, Putney as constituted on 11 September 1860 or of the poor thereof.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £12,846
Total expenditure: £12,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Edward Spencer Atkins Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Finna Ayres Trustee 25 September 2022
WANDSWORTH COMBINED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev JOHN WHITTAKER Trustee 02 July 2019
MILES TRUST FOR THE PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S PARISH TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE
Received: On time
LESLIE FRANCIS MCDONNELL Trustee 12 April 2018
MAYOR OF WANDSWORTHS CHARITY
Received: On time
WANDSWORTH COMMUNITY SAFETY TRUST
Received: On time
ANNETTE WATSON Trustee 13 June 2016
None on record
Pamela Jean Harris Trustee 13 June 2016
ROEHAMPTON PARISH TRUST
Received: 113 days late
CLEMANCY GORDON-MARTIN Trustee 14 February 2013
None on record
ORIANE HALDANE Trustee
None on record
PAUL JAMES DONNELLY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £12.24k £12.30k £12.62k £12.83k £12.85k
Total expenditure £12.72k £9.52k £10.27k £12.60k £12.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 1
Ashdown
7 Cambalt Road
LONDON
SW15 6EL
Phone:
02087893760
Website:

No information available